Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Campbell, Peter John (CPSO#: 51970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Bayly Street suite 505
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-1236
Fax: (905) 683-1271
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

RVHS Ajax Hospitals
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter J. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Campbell ( CPSO# 51970 )

Business Address:
505 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 683-1236

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOHN CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985