Campbell, Robert James (CPSO#: 73664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Opthalmology
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital site
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310 Ext. 3189
Fax: (613) 546-2731
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Campbell ( CPSO# 74055 )
Dr. R. Campbell ( CPSO# 73664 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Opthamology
166 Brock Street
Suite J2-019
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2004