Campbell, Susan Margaret Christine (CPSO#: 68101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1058
200 Taunton Road West
Whitby ON  L1R 3H8
Phone: (905) 444-9636
Fax: (905) 444-9853
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean E. Godfrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Godfrey ( CPSO# 65777 )
Dr. S. Campbell ( CPSO# 68101 )

Business Address:
Unit 1058
200 Taunton Road West
Whitby ON  L1R 3H8
Phone Number: (905) 444-9636

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARGARET CHRISTINE CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998