Campbell, Suzanne Michelle (CPSO#: 72159)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2007