Campbell, Verne Malcolm (CPSO#: 33365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vern M. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Campbell ( CPSO# 33365 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERNE MALCOLM CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1982