Campion, George Frederick John (CPSO#: 12780)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1949
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012