Canby, Joan Isabel (CPSO#: 20598)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 1995