Candusso, Cathryn Anne (CPSO#: 62235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone: (519) 938-8000
Fax: (519) 938-8080
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Cino and Cathy Candusso Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Candusso ( CPSO# 62235 )
Dr. P. Cino ( CPSO# 62225 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone Number: (519) 938-8000

Business Address:
Headwaters HealthCare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHRYN ANNE CANDUSSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANDUSSO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1992