Canil, Katherine Anne (CPSO#: 62558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
POBox 2314
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Phone: (867) 222-0139

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ANNE CANIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANIL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1991