Canning, Gerardine Anne (CPSO#: 50310)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Cunningham, Gerardine Anne (used until: 09 Oct 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2000