Canning, Stephanie Denise (CPSO#: 98563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
166 Brock St
Ottawa ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 533-2543
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 03 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE DENISE CANNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANNING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2017 to 31 Jul 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016