Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cannon, Crystal Ellen (CPSO#: 29299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth and Smiths Falls
District Hospital
60 Corneila Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone: (613) 282-2330
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Middleton & Cannon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRYSTAL ELLEN CANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANNON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1977