Canny, Gerard Joyce (CPSO#: 50341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 queensway west
21 queensway west
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Fax: (905) 897-9229
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERARD JOYCE CANNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANNY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1983