Cano, Paul Bernard (CPSO#: 59361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
230 Canboro Street
Smithville ON  L0R 2A0
Phone: (905) 957-3328
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Cano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2008

Dr. P. Cano ( CPSO# 59361 )

Business Address:
230 Canborough Street
Smithville ON  L0R 2A0
Phone Number: (905) 957-3328

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. PAUL BERNARD CANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Oct 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989