Cant, John Donald (CPSO#: 46208)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jan 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jan 1993