Cantarutti, Paul Gary (CPSO#: 58304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-3103
Fax: (905) 853-2533
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul G. Cantarutti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cantarutti ( CPSO# 58304 )

Business Address:
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-3103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL GARY CANTARUTTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANTARUTTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1988