Cantin, Sylvie Marie Denise (CPSO#: 76669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 Deacon st
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone: (613) 732-3422
Fax: (613) 732-7115
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cantin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cantin ( CPSO# 76669 )

Business Address:
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone Number: (613) 732-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVIE MARIE DENISE CANTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003