Cantor, Warren (CPSO#: 63855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: 888-552-1562
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Cantor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Cantor ( CPSO# 63855 )

Business Address:
Medical Arts Building
581 Davis Drive
Suite 602
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARREN CANTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANTOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992