Cao, Jeffrey Quoc (CPSO#: 82858)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Q. Cao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: London Regional Cancer Program 800 Commissioners Rd E, London ON N6K 1C2
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017