Capek, Lucie (CPSO#: 67596)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2010