Capello-Desjardins, Nancy Jean (CPSO#: 68042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4710
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Capello-Desjardins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Capello-Desjardins ( CPSO# 68042 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4710

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY JEAN CAPELLO-DESJARDINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAPELLO-DESJARDINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996