Capes, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 63552)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2009