Caplan, Jason Ari (CPSO#: 73536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone: (905) 456-6816
Fax: (905) 456-0490
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5460 Yonge street
#204
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Canada
Phone: (416) 250-7171
Fax: (416) 250-0323
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Caplan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Caplan ( CPSO# 73536 )

Business Address:
110 - 164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 456-6816

Business Address:
204 - 5460 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Phone Number: (416) 250-7171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON ARI CAPLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAPLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001