Carbin, Robert Jardine (CPSO#: 21486)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Safe Stor Records Management 2704 Highway 20 Fonthill ON L0S 1E6
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015