Carette, Simon (CPSO#: 32421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
E W 1 422
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6751
Fax: (416) 603-4348
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Langlois ( CPSO# 32451 )
Dr. S. Carette ( CPSO# 32421 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
EW-1-422 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6751

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON CARETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARETTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jan 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998