Carew, Maureen Teresa (CPSO#: 59663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carling Campus, DFHP, DND
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON K1A 0K2
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K6
Phone: (613) 901 9385
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAUREEN TERESA CAREW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAREW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989