Carey, Chinyere Sinobi (CPSO#: 77093)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Havana, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2001 to 25 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2003 to 13 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2004