Carey, Lewis Stafford De Sausmarez (CPSO#: 13792)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 Mar 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1996