Carey, Megan Lynn (CPSO#: 97762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: Sample, Megan Lynn (used until: 10 Jul 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2285
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN LYNN CAREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAREY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2017