Cargill, Yvonne Marie (CPSO#: 57469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Harmony Medical Centre
Suite 101
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 728-6212
Fax: (613) 728-3866
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital
High Risk Unit
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4401
Fax: (613) 761-5141
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Labor and Delivery
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4570
Fax: (613) 761-5390
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yvonne Cargill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Cargill ( CPSO# 57469 )

Business Address:
Harmony Medical Centre
Suite 101
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 728-6212

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
OB/Gyne Ultrasound
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4401

Business Address:
105 - 152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 224-1166

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVONNE MARIE CARGILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARGILL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1991