Carlier, Maureen Theresa (CPSO#: 50346)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Andhra University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carlier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 23 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Montfort Hospital 713 Montreal Road Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Date Received: 30 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2016