Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Carlile, John Batchin (CPSO#: 64316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Limestone City Sleep Laboratory
920 Princess St
Suite 110
Kingston ON  K7L 1H1
Phone: (613) 547-9172
Fax: (613) 547-9910
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Carlile Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 13 2012


Corporation Name: J.B. Carlile Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carlile ( CPSO# 64316 )

Business Address:
Dr. Carlile Sleep Laboratory
235 Brock Street
Suite 1
Kingston ON  K7L 1S3
Phone Number: (613) 547-9172

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN BATCHIN CARLILE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLILE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1995