Carling-Chambers, Lucille Barbara (CPSO#: 50347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 1984

Summary

Former Name: Carling, Lucille Barbara (used until: 26 Jul 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2104 Old Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1A3
Phone: (905) 632-3531
Fax: (905) 632-1126
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L.B. Carling-Chambers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Carling-Chambers ( CPSO# 50347 )

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
2104 Old Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 632-3531

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCILLE BARBARA CARLING-CHAMBERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLING-CHAMBERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1984