Carlisle, Euan James Frazer (CPSO#: 60125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Hospital
Division Of Nephrology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33741
Fax: (905) 521-6088
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Euan Carlisle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Carlisle ( CPSO# 60125 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Nephrology Department
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUAN JAMES FRAZER CARLISLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLISLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1989