Carll, David John (CPSO#: 22781)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1970
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 30 Oct 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 May 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Jul 2002
Summary:

 On July 9, 2002, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Carll guilty of professional misconduct in that 
 he engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, in 
 that he sexually harassed 7 female health care professionals, failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession as well as sexual impropriety with respect to examinations of two 
 patients.

On September 13, 2002, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:

1)	Dr. 
 Carll be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register
2)	Twelve (12) 
 month suspensioin, six (6) months of which to be suspended if Dr. Carll 	completes the College(s 
 boudary course.
3)	Costs to the College in the amount of $25,000.00

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 28 Sep 2004
Hearing Date(s): May 22, 2001