Carlsen, Niels Lloyd (CPSO#: 18977)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Danish, English

Education:Queen's University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Sandra Voice 501-3030 Lawrence Ave E Scarborough, ON M1P 2T7
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017