Carlson, Jacqueline Anne Kyle (CPSO#: 21271)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of London, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2002