Carmody, Ian Charles (CPSO#: 65579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1514 Jefferson Highway
New Orleans LA  70115
United States
Phone: (504) 912-4657

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Louisiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN CHARLES CARMODY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARMODY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993