Carmona, Rajendra Junior (CPSO#: 83101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 708
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 521-9034
Fax: (905) 521-8099
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Carmona Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Carmona ( CPSO# 83101 )

Business Address:
708 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 521-9034

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 15 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJENDRA JUNIOR CARMONA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARMONA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008