Caro, Jonathan (CPSO#: 52752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1984

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3080 Yonge Street
Suite 3026
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone: (416) 932-9096
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN CARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1984
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Oct 2005

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Jun 2005
Summary:

 On June 7, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Caro to have committed an act of professional 
 misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable, or unprofessional in that he sold a house which he co-owned to a patient, and 
 repeatedly breached boundaries by involving a patient in his family life and integrating the 
 patient into his religious community. 

The Discipline Committee directed the following:

1.	The 
 Registrar to suspend Dr. Caro(s certificate of registration for a period of two months 	commencing 
 on August 1, 2005;

2..	The Registrar to suspend Dr. Caro(s certificate of registration for one 
 additional month, to 	commence on January 1, 2006, which shall be suspended if Dr. Caro 
 successfully 	completes, at his own expense, the college(s Ethics Course and the College(s 
 Boundaries 	Course and provides proof thereof to the College by December 30, 2005; and 

3.	That 
 Dr. Caro pay the College costs of $2,500.00

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 07, 2005