Carol, Angela Marie (CPSO#: 70205)

Current Status: Active Member - CPSO Staff as of 10 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Urban Core Community
Health Centre
71 Rebecca Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1B6
Phone: (905) 522-3233
Fax: (905) 522-3706
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wellbeings Pain Management and
Addiction services185 Plains Rd E
OHP Level I Consultations only
Burlington ON  L7T 2C4
Canada
Phone: (905) 631-9355
Fax: 905 631 9355
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA MARIE CAROL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAROL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998