Caron, Catherine Margaret (CPSO#: 60925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613)737-8132
Fax: (613)739-6177
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Caron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Caron ( CPSO# 60925 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 262-5729

Business Address:
113 4th Street
Rainy River ON  P0W 1L0
Phone Number: (807) 852-3222

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARGARET CARON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1991