Carothers, Melanie (CPSO#: 42532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: Kapiarumalayil, Melanie (used until: 12 May 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Freeport Site
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 7357
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Winston Park SCF
695 Blockline Road
Kitchener ON  N2G 3W5
Canada
Phone: (519) 576-2430
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

46 Lanark Cres
Kitchener
Kitchener ON  N2E 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (519) 743-4200
Fax: (519) 746-0906
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

The Westmount
200 David Bergey Drive
Kitchener ON  N2E 3Y4
Canada
Phone: (519) 570-2115
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Carothers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Carothers ( CPSO# 42532 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Freeport Site
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
The Westmount
200 David Bergie Drive
Kitchener ON  N2E 3Y4
Phone Number: (519) 570-2115

Business Address:
Winston Park SCF
695 Block Line Road
Kitchener ON  N2G 3W5
Phone Number: (519) 576-2430

Business Address:
46 Lanark Crescent
Kitchener ON  N2N 2Z8
Phone Number: (519) 743-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE CAROTHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAROTHERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1988