Carpenter, Jenn Leslie (CPSO#: 71601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Orthopedic and Pain
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone: (613) 344-1202
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jenn Carpenter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carpenter ( CPSO# 71601 )

Business Address:
Kingston Orthopedic and Pain
797 Princess Street
Suite 500
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 507-7246

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Tanzania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENN LESLIE CARPENTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARPENTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003