Carpenter, Laura Marie (CPSO#: 71247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients who saw Dr. Carpenter at the London Learning Clinic looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com Patients who saw Dr. Carpenter at The Clinic, Middlesex London Health Unit looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact that location at: 50 King Street London, ON N6A 5L7
Date Received: 09 Jul 2008


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: London Learning Clinic Room 121 723 Lorne Avenue London Ontario N5W 3K7 Tel: (519) 438-1568
Date Received: 09 Jul 2008

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA MARIE CARPENTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARPENTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1999