Carpenter, Lorne Evans (CPSO#: 11174)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1942

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1947 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1866
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1943
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 06 Feb 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 04 May 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992