Carpenter, Travis Daniel (CPSO#: 97767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
General Internal Medicine
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Room E209
General Internal Medicine Division
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Travis D. Carpenter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kim ( CPSO# 103681)
Dr. T. Carpenter ( CPSO# 97767 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
General Internal Medicine Division
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRAVIS DANIEL CARPENTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARPENTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016