Carr, David (CPSO#: 76297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 YORK STREET
Toronto ON  M5H3S5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

399 BATHURST ST
Toronto ON  M5T2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5190
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

399 BATHURST ST
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5190
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Carr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Carr ( CPSO# 76297 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2041

Business Address:
Suite 1400
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5190

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Department
R F G E S
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3947

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003