Carr, Lesley Katherine (CPSO#: 60803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Unit MG501
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5113
Fax: (416) 480-5116
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lesley Carr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Carr ( CPSO# 60803 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences
Unit MG501
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5113

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLEY KATHERINE CARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1991