Carr, Megan Rebecca (CPSO#: 84916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: Hogan, Megan Rebecca (used until: 17 Dec 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
445 Inglehart North
Oakville ON  L6J 3J5
Phone: (905) 844-8800
Fax: (905) 844-8200
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Megan Carr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Carr ( CPSO# 84916 )

Business Address:
445 Inglehart North
Oakville ON  L6J 3J5
Phone Number: (905) 844-8800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Sep 2008 CFPC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN REBECCA CARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 28 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2008